MA H2213 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to post-retirement earnings of public retirees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to post-retirement earnings of public retirees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied by S1579, H2243 and H2266 |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2203 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1578 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1536 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1503 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Accompanied H2346
H2232 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1579 (Replaces) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
H2243 (Replaces) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
H2266 (Replaces) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
S1578 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1536 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1503 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Accompanied H2346
H2232 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1579 (Replaces) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
H2243 (Replaces) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
H2266 (Replaces) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2213 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2213.pdf |