MA H2213 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
That police departments be required to notify school superintendents upon the issuance of felony complaints against students
Title
That police departments be required to notify school superintendents upon the issuance of felony complaints against students
Sponsors
Rep. James Fagan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-19 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-05-17 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2010-03-22 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 6/4 at 11:00 AM in Hearing Room A2 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h02213.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht02/ht02213.htm |