MA H2209 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide equal access to medical treatments essential for persons with autism. Health Care Financing.
Title
Ensuring equal access to medical treatments essential for people with autism
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Barber [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] |
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-05-23 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-05-23 | House | Accompanied by S646 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2017 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S287 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
S1221 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S646 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H2209
S1106 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
S1980 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
H500 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied H2955
S1221 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S646 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H2209
S1106 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
S1980 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
H500 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied H2955
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2209 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2209.pdf |