MA H2204 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a service-based retirement option for Group 1 and Group 2 employees with 30 or more years of service. Public Service.
Title
Relative to a service based retirement option for Group 1 and Group 2 career employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-01-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2016 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3250 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
H1197 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1198 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H319 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2095 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
S2519 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 446 of the Acts of 2016
H1197 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1198 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H319 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2095 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
S2519 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 446 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2204 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2204.pdf |