MA H2197 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4486

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 80-15-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect public health from PFAS. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect Massachusetts public health from PFAS

Sponsors

Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Rep. James Arena-DeRosa [D]Rep. Steven Owens [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]
Rep. Adam Scanlon [D]Rep. Rodney Elliott [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]
Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Patricia Duffy [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Aaron Saunders [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Adrianne Ramos [D]
Rep. Simon Cataldo [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Jessica Giannino [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. Samantha Montano [D]Rep. Sally Kerans [D]Rep. Joseph McKenna [R]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]
Rep. Michelle DuBois [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Margaret Scarsdale [D]
Rep. Ted Philips [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]
Rep. Kelly Pease [R]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]
Rep. Danillo Sena [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Christopher Flanagan [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jennifer Balinsky Armini [D]Sen. Lydia Edwards [D]
Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Marcus Vaughn [R]
Sen. John Keenan [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Carol Doherty [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Jeffrey Turco [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R]
Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Fred Barrows [R]Rep. David Vieira [R]
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. Kristin Kassner [D]
Rep. Christopher Markey [D]Rep. Kate Donaghue [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]
Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-25HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4486
2023-06-09JointHearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H4486 (Replaced by) 2024-03-25 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S1356 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4486
H4288 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H863 (Similar To) 2023-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S39 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4288

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback