MA H2191 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1152
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-03 - Accompanied S1152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-03 - Accompanied S1152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the University of Massachusetts Police Department. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the University of Massachusetts Police Department
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | Senate | Accompanied S1152 |
2013-03-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/27/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1152 (Replaced by) 2014-03-13 - New draft substituted, see S2045
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2191 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2191.pdf |