MA H2181 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4778

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to substance use disorder diversion and treatment. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to substance use disorder diversion and treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-18HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4778
2017-07-12JointHearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1065 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2392 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S815 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H3510 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
S539 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H1353 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4725 (Similar To) 2018-07-11 - Published as amended, see H4742
H4742 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2018
S2609 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2623 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback