MA H2177 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1238
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Accompanied S1238
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Accompanied S1238
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Smola of Warren, a petition of Todd M. Smola, Shaunna L. O’Connell and Kevin J. Kuros that the Executive Office of Public Safety be directed to create a blue alert system, so-called, for the apprehension of individuals wanted for seriously injuring or killing law enforcement officials. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to implementing a blue alert system in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Accompanied S1238 |
2015-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1238 (Replaced by) 2016-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3286 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2827 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3086 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H954 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2412 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3286 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2827 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3086 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H954 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2412 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2177 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2177.pdf |