MA H2170 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to preserve the competitiveness of group marketing plans for automobile and homeowners insurance. Financial Services.
Title
To preserve the competitiveness of group marketing plans for automobile and homeowners insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4081 |
2017-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4081 (Replaced by) 2017-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 168 of the Acts of 2017
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2170 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2170.pdf |