MA H2165 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4611
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the construction of manufactured buildings. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to manufactured buildings
Sponsors
Rep. James O'Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4611 |
2015-10-09 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H4611 (Replaced by) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H110 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4534
H2801 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2028 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4068
H3212 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1756 (Similar To) 2015-10-13 - Accompanied S999
H4761 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 386 of the Acts of 2016
H110 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4534
H2801 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2028 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4068
H3212 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1756 (Similar To) 2015-10-13 - Accompanied S999
H4761 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 386 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2165 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2165.pdf |