MA H2164 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4933
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Golden of Lowell, a petition of Thomas A. Golden, Jr., that permit granting authorities allow for electronic submission of the permit applications and associated documentation for the installation of certain solar systems. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to solar permitting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4933 |
2021-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4933 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2164 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2164.pdf |