MA H2155 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Dukes County Sheriff’s regional lockup fund. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Establishing the Dukes County Sheriff’s regional lockup fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-09-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-09-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3141 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5418 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H5418 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2155 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2155.pdf |