MA H2154 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to decrease the frequency of required elevator inspections in small towns from annually to every five years. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to elevator inspections for small towns
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Rep. Timothy Madden [D] | Rep. Stephen Kulik [D] | Sen. Benjamin Downing [D] |
Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. William Pignatelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-10-09 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H227 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H907 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1010 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1011 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1482 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4748 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H907 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1010 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1011 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1482 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4748 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2154 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2154.pdf |