MA H2152 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-12)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to emergency response in an active shooter or hostile event situation. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to emergency response in an active shooter or hostile event situation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-08-22 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 08/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-08-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H3492 (Similar To) 2020-03-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S203 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S2078 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
S912 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1450 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2883 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S203 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S2078 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
S912 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1450 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2883 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2152 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2152.pdf |