MA H215 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4711
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Santiago of Boston, a petition of Jon Santiago and others that the Department of Developmental Services establish caseload ratios for certain human service coordinators. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Improving front-line service coordinators quality of care
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Santiago [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D] |
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Shirley Arriaga [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4711 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H2643 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Senate concurred
S83 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2645
H4711 (Replaced by) 2024-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S83 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2645
H4711 (Replaced by) 2024-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H215 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H215.pdf |