MA H2146 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2076
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to police officer standards and training. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Resolve providing for a “Special Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training” to study and make recommendations concerning the implementation of a Peace Officers Standards and Training (POST) system
Sponsors
Rep. David Vieira [R] | Rep. Russell Holmes [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] |
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2020-02-24 | House | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied by H2076 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1874 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S971 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2169 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
S2170 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H3586 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2021 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2963 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Senate concurred
H2076 (Replaces) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2146
S971 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2169 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
S2170 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H3586 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2021 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2963 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Senate concurred
H2076 (Replaces) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2146
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2146 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2146.pdf |