MA H2129 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4579
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the building of structures which may impact sunlight in certain public parks. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Protecting sunlight in certain public parks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4579 |
2017-04-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3749 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2017
H4579 (Replaced by) 2018-06-07 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4579 (Replaced by) 2018-06-07 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2129 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2129.pdf |