MA H2125 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1118
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Accompanied S1118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Accompanied S1118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require training for police and correction officers interacting with persons with autism spectrum disorders. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the criminal justice training regarding autistic persons.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Brodeur [D] | Rep. Tom Sannicandro [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Gloria Fox [D] |
Sen. Karen Spilka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied S1118 |
2013-09-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:30 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1118 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2125 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2125.pdf |