MA H2123 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2161
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H2161
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H2161
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the use of seat belts on certain school buses. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to seat belts on school buses
Sponsors
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Accompanied H2161 |
2015-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2161 (Replaced by) 2016-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2123 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2123.pdf |