MA H2121 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4460
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate certain restrictions on housing development or building permits under zoning ordinances in cities and towns. Housing.
Title
Authorizing limited rate of growth controls and to promote housing production
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4460 |
2011-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4460 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2121 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9463&generalCourtId=1 |