MA H2103 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1952
Note: Legislation replaced by H4228
Note: Legislation replaced by H4228
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - New draft substituted, see H4228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - New draft substituted, see H4228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to creating a folic acid awareness and birth defects prevention program within the Department of Public Health. Public Health.
Title
Relative to folic acid awareness and birth defects prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | House | New draft substituted, see H4228 |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted |
2014-06-25 | House | Amendment (H4076) rejected |
2014-06-25 | House | Read second |
2014-06-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-06-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendments pending |
2014-06-25 | House | Committee recommends bill ought to pass with an amendment substituting a bill, see H4228 |
2014-05-14 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending |
2014-05-14 | House | Committee recommends bill ought to pass with an amendment substituting a bill with the same title, see H4076 |
2013-10-10 | House | Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-10-10 | House | Accompanied by H1952 |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1952 (Replaces) 2013-10-10 - Accompanied H2103
H4228 (Replaced by) 2014-06-26 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4228 (Replaced by) 2014-06-26 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2103 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2103.pdf |