MA H210 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing the penalties to motor vehicle dealers for certain sales of used police vehicles. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to used police cars sold at auction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-05-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-04-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H986 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H985 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H982 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H737 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H983 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H986 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H985 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H982 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H737 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H983 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H210 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H210.pdf |