MA H210 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to consumer protections with regard to cemeteries and crematories. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to consumer protections with regard to cemeteries and crematories
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Kafka [D] | Rep. John Rogers [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-04-07 | House | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2015-09-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4733 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 391 of the Acts of 2016
H1416 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1984 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1848 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1416 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1984 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1848 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H210 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H210.pdf |