MA H2091 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4611
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the personal use of hoisting equipment. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to personal use of hoisting equipment
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R] | Sen. Peter Durant [R] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] |
Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4611 |
2016-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2016 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H4611 (Replaced by) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2090 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H2449 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H311 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
H312 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2331
H3129 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
H2090 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H2449 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H311 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
H312 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2331
H3129 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2091 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2091.pdf |