MA H2065 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5281
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide mental health benefits on a nondiscriminatory basis to certain residents of the Commonwealth. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To update mental health parity
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] |
Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5281 |
2022-06-08 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H3637 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1110 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1515 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H457 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H1557 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied S923
S930 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2956
S923 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2943
S2979 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5281 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1110 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1515 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H457 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H1557 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied S923
S930 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2956
S923 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2943
S2979 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5281 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2065 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2065.pdf |