MA H2064 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include transportation costs in the special education reimbursement program. Education.
Title
Relative to special education transportation costs
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Smizik [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Rep. John Rogers [D] |
Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2017-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S224 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
S225 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H89 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S319 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
S250 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S508 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H332 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H264 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H4706 (Replaced by) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S225 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H89 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S319 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
S250 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S508 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H332 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H264 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H4706 (Replaced by) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2064 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2064.pdf |