MA H2062 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to payments for psychological services provided by MassHealth. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Relative to increasing access to psychological services
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Rep. Adam Scanlon [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
Rep. Michael Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-07 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1010 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H1040 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H2286 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5197
S672 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S809 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2787
H1040 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H2286 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5197
S672 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S809 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2787
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2062 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2062.pdf |