MA H2021 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4451
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Provost of Somerville, a petition of Denise Provost and others that the Department of Environmental Protection and the Department of Public Health develop health risk assessment guidelines of proposed school construction sites. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Protecting school children from environmental toxins
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] |
Rep. Carl Sciortino [D] | Rep. Ellen Story [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-27 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4451 |
2012-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2011 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4451 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2021 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10893&generalCourtId=1 |