MA H2019 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the adoption of permanent Joint Rules for the 190th General Court governing the 2017-2018 legislative sessions (House, No. 2019). February 2, 2017.
Title
An Order relative to the adoption of permanent Joint Rules for the 190th General Court governing the 2017-2018 legislative sessions (House, No. 2019)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - House On Amendment 14 Yea and Nay No. 21 (Y: 38 N: 121 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-02 - House - House On Amendment 13 Yea and Nay No. 20 (Y: 37 N: 121 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-02 - House - House On Amendment 11 Yea and Nay No. 19 (Y: 38 N: 120 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-02 - House - House On Amendment 5 Yea and Nay No. 18 (Y: 37 N: 122 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-02 - House - House On Amendment 13 Yea and Nay No. 20 (Y: 37 N: 121 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-02 - House - House On Amendment 11 Yea and Nay No. 19 (Y: 38 N: 120 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-02 - House - House On Amendment 5 Yea and Nay No. 18 (Y: 37 N: 122 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in the further House amendment |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-02-15 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment, see H2020 |
2017-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reprinted, as amended, see S19 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Amended (Montigny) by striking out the text in its entirety and inserting in place thereof the text of S9 |
2017-02-02 | House | Order adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | Amendment 14 rejected - 38 YEAS to 121 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 21) |
2017-02-02 | House | Amendment 13 rejected - 37 YEAS to 122 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 20) |
2017-02-02 | House | Amendment 11 rejected - 38 YEAS to 121 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 19) |
2017-02-02 | House | Amendment 10 rejected |
2017-02-02 | House | Amendment 7 adopted, as changed |
2017-02-02 | House | Amendment 5 rejected - 37 YEAS to 122 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 18) |
2017-02-02 | House | Amendment 4 rejected |
2017-02-02 | House | Amendment 3 rejected |
2017-02-02 | House | Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee recommended ought to be adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to the temporary committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S9 (Replaced by) 2017-02-02 - Reprinted as amended, see S19
S19 (Replaced by) 2017-02-02 - See H2019
H2020 (Replaced by) 2017-02-15 - Text of an amendment, see H2019
H2017 (Similar To) 2017-02-02 - Published as amended, see H2018
H2018 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H736 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4296 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Adopted
H4711 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S19 (Replaced by) 2017-02-02 - See H2019
H2020 (Replaced by) 2017-02-15 - Text of an amendment, see H2019
H2017 (Similar To) 2017-02-02 - Published as amended, see H2018
H2018 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H736 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4296 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Adopted
H4711 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken