MA H2017 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4451
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Kocot of Northampton, a petition of Peter V. Kocot and others for the establishment of product stewardship programs to provide free of charge recycling when products are sold or discarded. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To create a framework to re-allocate responsibility for discarded products
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Kocot [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] |
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Carl Sciortino [D] | Rep. Ellen Story [D] |
Rep. Cleon Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-27 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4451 |
2011-05-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:50 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4451 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2017 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14401&generalCourtId=1 |