MA H2011 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4712
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4712
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4712
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand equity and access to patient centered care for substance abuse disorders. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To expand equity and access to patient centered care for substance abuse disorder
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4712 |
2023-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-29 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2023-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1274 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1391 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2927
H4712 (Replaced by) 2024-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1391 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2927
H4712 (Replaced by) 2024-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2011 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2011.pdf |