MA H2008 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3971
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3971
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3971
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to certified professional midwives. Public Health.
Title
Relative to certified professional midwives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3971 |
2013-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2013 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H3971 (Replaced by) 2014-05-21 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2008 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2008.pdf |