MA H2007 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to authorizing physician assistants to issue psychiatric holds and ensure adequate training on their use. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enabling physician assistants to authorize psychiatric holds and ensure adequate training on their use

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-11SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 15, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-10-26JointHearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2023-10-26JointHearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-10-23JointHearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

S1354 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1950 (Similar To) 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4570

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback