MA H200 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-07 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-07 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to eligibility for certain entitlement programs. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to the utilization of the systematic alien verification for entitlements program by the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-07 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S1998 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1169 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2633
S1169 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2633
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H200 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H200.pdf |