MA H1992 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4695
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4695
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4695
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to telecommunications systems contractors and technicians. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to telecommunications systems contractors and technicians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4695 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 9, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H1449 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied S1479
S1479 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1500 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H3766 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H4412 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2498 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4695 (Replaced by) 2018-07-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1479 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1500 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H3766 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H4412 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2498 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4695 (Replaced by) 2018-07-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1992 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1992.pdf |