MA H1989 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4638
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the termination of sales to wholesalers by suppliers of alcoholic beverages. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to termination of sales to wholesalers by suppliers of alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4638 |
2017-10-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H209 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1559 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1476 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S141 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S119 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1559 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1476 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S141 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S119 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1989 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1989.pdf |