MA H1985 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect the privacy and security of biometric information. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Updating chapter 93H data security protections to include biometric information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-26HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-07-26HouseRules suspended
2017-07-26HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-07-20HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-05-09JointHearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H253 (Similar To) 2017-08-31 - Hearing scheduled for 09/05/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 & A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback