MA H1980 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4449
Note: Legislation replaced by H5038

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5038
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to HIV antibody or antigen testing. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to HLTV 111 tests

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-15HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5038
2020-04-23SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-02HouseReporting date extended to Saturday May 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-24HouseRecommitted to the committee on Public Health
2020-02-24HouseReported on a part of H4449
2020-02-24HouseReported from the committee on House Rules
2020-02-24HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4449
2019-12-02JointHearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-09-26JointHearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H3327 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1265 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied S1237
S1236 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1898 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886
H5038 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback