MA H1975 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2152
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring child-resistant packaging of nicotine liquid containers. Public Health.
Title
Requiring child-resistant packaging of nicotine liquid containers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2152 |
2015-07-14 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-07-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2152 (Replaced by) 2016-04-28 - New draft substituted, see S2234
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1975 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1975.pdf |