MA H1973 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4427
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4427
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4427
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to mandate domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education for aestheticians, barbers, cosmetologists, electrologists, hairdressers, manicurists and massage therapists. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To mandate domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education for aestheticians, barbers, cosmetologists, electrologists, hairdressers, manicurists, and massage therapists
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Barber [D] | Rep. Paul Donato [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
Rep. Mike Connolly [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4427 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 9, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3465 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4427
H778 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H823 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H781 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S894 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H889 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2317 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4427 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H778 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H823 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H781 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S894 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H889 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2317 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4427 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1973 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1973.pdf |