MA H1968 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for the establishment of senior citizen safety zones in cities and towns. Elder Affairs.
Title
Authorizing the establishment of senior citizen safety zones
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Carl Sciortino [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] |
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2011-09-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-09-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-09-01 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-08-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1968 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10622&generalCourtId=1 |