MA H1966 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4792
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Lyons of Andover, a petition of James J. Lyons, Jr. that public benefits only be received by individuals who are residents of the Commonwealth and have proper verifiable documents or identification from their country of origin. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to public benefit requirements
Sponsors
Rep. James Lyons [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4792 |
2017-10-19 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/24/2017 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S2000 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H102 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
S520 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H78 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
S73 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
H2414 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H801 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1870 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H197 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1671 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H3826 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4792 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H102 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
S520 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H78 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
S73 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
H2414 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H801 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1870 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H197 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1671 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H3826 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4792 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1966 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1966.pdf |