MA H1966 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S266
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the calculation of income for spouses of nursing home residents. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to the calculation of income for spouses of nursing home residents.
Sponsors
Rep. John Fernandes [D] | Rep. Denise Andrews [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Rep. Stephen DiNatale [D] |
Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Rep. Martin Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-06-14 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-12-01 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-12-01 | House | Accompanied by S266 |
2011-11-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S266 (Replaces) 2011-12-01 - Accompanied H1966
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1966 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8254&generalCourtId=1 |