MA H1958 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-13)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to change the name of the Disabled Persons Protection Commission to the commission for the protection of persons with disabilities and updating the terminology and investigative practices related to the protection of persons with disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Updating the terminology and investigative practices related to the protection of persons with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1958 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1958.pdf |