MA H1955 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4796
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4796
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4796
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to clean energy workforce standards and accountability. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to clean energy workforce standards and accountability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4796 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 13, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1198 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4796
S1422 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3174
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H2398 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5461
H4201 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
S1234 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S2167 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H4796 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1197 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4796
S2202 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1422 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3174
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H2398 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5461
H4201 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
S1234 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S2167 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H4796 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1197 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4796
S2202 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1955 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1955.pdf |