MA H1952 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to recovered amounts of child support obligations. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To bring child support home
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-07-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-05-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S30 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1680 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1680 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1952 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1952.pdf |