MA H1948 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-08 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H4019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-08 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H4019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow a check-off box on municipal tax bills or motor vehicle excise tax bills for donations to municipal veterans memorial and patriotic celebration funds. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Allowing any town or city to designate a check-off box on it's municipal tax bills or motor vehicle excise tax bills to donate or pledge an amount of money
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-08 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 278 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill, H4019 |
2017-11-08 | House | Read third (title changed) |
2017-11-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-11-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1640 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1551
H123 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4563
S1605 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1499 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4000
S1647 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1611 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1607 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3707 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
H3702 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
H123 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4563
S1605 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1499 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4000
S1647 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1611 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1607 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3707 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
H3702 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1948 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1948.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov//Journal/House/190/RollCalls/hj11082017_RollCalls.pdf |