MA H1944 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4265
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to air pollutants. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the public health effects of hazardous air pollutants
Sponsors
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] | Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Rep. Tom Sannicandro [D] | Rep. Denise Andrews [D] |
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4265 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 09:30 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4265 (Replaced by) 2014-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H3975
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1944 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1944.pdf |