MA H1939 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the administration of medications in the home by certain home health aides. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to home health and hospice aides

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22HouseReporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-26HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-11-07JointHearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1713 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4533
H1702 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H915 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S640 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1142 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S721 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1246 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback