MA H193 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Accompanied S88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Accompanied S88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to children and adolescents with intensive behavioral health needs. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to children and adolescents with intensive behavioral health needs
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Kushmerek [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] |
Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Samantha Montano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Accompanied S88 |
2023-09-07 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S88 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H193 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H193.pdf |